SHATILA THEATRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity encourages cultural exchanges between artists of the North-East of England young people from Shatila Refugee Camp in Beirut, Lebanon. Activities over the past 2 years include the development, staging and UK tour of a play by schoolchildren from the refugee camp. Current plans include a street art project for 2012 spanning Beirut and North Tyneside, and a proposed choir for 2013.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
- Lebanon
Governance
- 03 March 2011: Standard registration
- 24 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £290 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £430 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTISTIC DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE INITIALLY AT THE SHATILA REFUGEE CAMP AND SUBSEQUENTLY AT OTHER LOCATIONS IN THE MIDDLE EAST AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT: A) THROUGH ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE CREATION, DEVELOPMENT, PRODUCTION, DIRECTION AND PRESENTATION OF THEATRICAL AND OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS. PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS. AWARD THEM SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO FURTHER THEIR ARTISTIC SKILLS PROVIDING THEM WITH TRAVEL IN THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH ACTIVITIES; B) THROUGH THE COLLABORATION OF REGIONAL ARTISTS FROM THE UK WITH THE AFOREMENTIONED YOUNG PEOPLE BY RECIPROCAL VISITS AND MUTUAL SUPPORT IN THE CREATION, DEVELOPMENT, DIRECTION AND PRESENTATION OF JOINT OR SEVERAL THEATRICAL AND OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS.
Area of benefit
SHATILA REFUGEE CAMP AND OTHER LOCATIONS IN THE MIDDLE EAST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window