Financial history CONCERTS IN THE WEST

Charity number: 1139301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.11k £15.46k £30.40k £100.06k £36.99k
Total expenditure £49.28k £39.73k £28.80k £50.85k £50.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A