CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF NAZARETH GENERALATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To share the love of God, through the ministries of care and education, through 35 Nazareth Houses caring mainly for frail older people, seven retirement villages and five education services in 38 different locations worldwide. The charity spiritually and financially supports these works, which are delivered in our regions via other Congregational and charitable bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,657,537
Donations and legacies | £8.93m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £730.35k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,145,989
Raising funds | £4.24k | |
Charitable activities | £7.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,093,354 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.14m | |
Retained for future use | £2.51m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.14m | |
Retained for future use | £4.60m |
People

5 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER BRENDA MCCALL | Chair | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sister Anne Margaret Craig | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Thi Xuan Linh Nguyen | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Mary Doolan | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Mary Monaghan | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98m | £12.00m | £2.23m | £2.17m | £9.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56m | £1.63m | £6.72m | £3.79m | £7.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.61m | £11.54m | £1.75m | £1.33m | £8.93m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £362.46k | £463.81k | £480.54k | £561.73k | £730.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £279.69k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £22.91k | £2.13k | £102.55k | £173.42k | £470.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.55m | £1.62m | £6.71m | £3.78m | £7.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.80k | £9.12k | £12.05k | £10.79k | £4.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.24k | £22.49k | £23.74k | £26.03k | £25.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £194.63k | £421.28k | £5.71m | £3.75m | £5.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.80k | £9.12k | £12.05k | £10.79k | £4.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.32m | £2.56m | £2.32m | £1.91m | £19.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.32m | £20.21m | £21.66m | £17.47m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £14.73m | £21.83m | £22.24m | £23.97m | £27.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £673.08k | £2.07m | £6.81m | £6.37m | £5.82m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL, CARE AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR GENERAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (THE "OBJECTS") AND IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL, CARE OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michaels
Nazareth House
169-175 Hammersmith Road
London
W6 8DB
- Phone:
- 02086006840
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window