JUDAH PRAISE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
buying of books and stationary for school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ghana
Governance
- 23 November 2010: Standard registration
- JPCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE ASARE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev LAWRENCE ASARE | Trustee |
|
||||||
BOBBY DANSO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £150 | £172 | £200 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £858 | £0 | £240 | £115 | £106 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 30 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED AFRICAN COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING IN UNDEVELOPED RURAL AREAS IN GHANA, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE IN THESE COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
GHANA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WENTWORTH ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3HX
- Phone:
- 0208 6831109
- Email:
- jpcommunitycentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window