MARANATHA CARE CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MARANATHA CARE CHILDREN IS A NON-PROFIT CHARITY AIMING TO HELP SOUTH AFRICAN CHILDREN BY OFFERING DEVELOPMENT IN EDUCATION AND LIFE SKILLS, PROVIDING SUITABLE HOME ENVIRONMENTS AND SAFEGUARDING THE FUTURES OF THOSE IN CARE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 16 December 2010: Standard registration
- MCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRISON DAX NASH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
EMMA CHARLOTTE SCOTT | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Soliman | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ELAINE NASH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.85k | £10.91k | £17.57k | £13.67k | £12.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.81k | £11.20k | £17.77k | £13.71k | £10.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/11/2010 as amended on 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN CARE IN SOUTH AFRICA FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THESE OBJECTS, 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. IN THIS CASE IT INCLUDES ORPHANS, STREET CHILDREN AND OTHER SOUTH AFRICAN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK, WHO ARE IN RESIDENTIAL CARE. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN SOUTH AFRICA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EDUCATION.4)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES RESIDING IN RURAL AREAS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Whiteford Road
Mannamead
Plymouth
PL3 5LX
- Phone:
- 07765184878
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window