MANSFIELDS HEROES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity has been set up to build and maintain a new war memorial in carr bank park mansfield to commemorate those who have lost their lives in conflicts since the second world war. any surplus funds raised will be donated to service charities to assist veterans from the mansfield area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 November 2010: Standard registration
- MHMF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMIE NEWTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HYATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM PARKER BA HONS, MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA GALE ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH SMALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MITCH MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.63k | £5.96k | £6.96k | £4.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.66k | £2.59k | £5.05k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 630 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 630 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 995 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 995 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1360 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1360 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1725 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1725 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A WAR MEMORIAL TO COMMEMORATE MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED SERVICES AND AFFILIATED SERVICES FORM MANSFIELD AND DISTRICTS WHO HAVE FALLEN IN CONFLICTS SINCE WORLD WAR 2.NG AND CONDUCTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF; (2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS
Area of benefit
MANSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 DANVERS DRIVE
MANSFIELD
NG19 6BT
- Phone:
- 01623655340
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window