DEBRE MEDHANIT KIDANE MEHRET ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH IN UK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S ACTIVITIES ARE A, WORSHIPING THE LORD B, TEACHING AND MAINTAINING THE DOCTRINE AND TRADITION OF THE ERITREAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN TEWAHDO CHURCH. B, UNITING THE MEMBERS OF THE ERITREAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN TEWAHDO CHURCH IN UK. C, PROMOTING TOLERANCE AND FRIENDLY RELATIONS WITH OTHER CHURCHES AND RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES. D, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ILLEITERACY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR GHEBRAT WOLDEGHIORGIS KAHSAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
REV LEUL TEKESTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.64k | £260.13k | £363.54k | £372.95k | £372.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.24k | £81.59k | £101.91k | £111.37k | £131.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/02/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX RELIGION IN ALL PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX RELIGION. 2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEBRE MEDHANIT KIDANE MEHRET
ERITREAN CHURCH
TUBBS ROAD
LONDON
ENGLAND
NW10 4SD
- Phone:
- 07939590721
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window