LEEDS BECKETT STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We represent 26,000 students to the University; the local community and nationally. We provide safe social and cultural spaces for our members by running venues and an events hall. We also provide a free and independent Advice Service for students and we provide opportunities for participation and development through volunteering, societies and work opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,269,068
Donations and legacies | £1.71m | |
Charitable activities | £64.39k | |
Other trading activities | £463.15k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £27.84k |
Total expenditure:
£2,372,670
Raising funds | £691.85k | |
Charitable activities | £1.68m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £691.85k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.68m |
People

80 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 December 2010: Standard registration
- LEEDS MET STUDENTS' UNION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Myhill | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bilaal Ashfak | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Meghna Chaudhary | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harish Jayaseelan | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Paul Riley | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhruv Dev | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lapish | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dowson | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Shilton Godwin | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Stephanie Bayne | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30m | £1.92m | £2.16m | £2.42m | £2.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12m | £1.68m | £2.12m | £2.52m | £2.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £213.71k | £11.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.53m | £1.53m | £1.55m | £1.75m | £1.71m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £564.91k | £56.96k | £545.62k | £584.08k | £463.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £208.56k | £223.30k | £48.63k | £78.63k | £64.39k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £3.39k | £118.58k | £13.01k | £7.49k | £27.84k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.30m | £1.36m | £1.49m | £1.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £743.95k | £380.65k | £760.07k | £1.03m | £691.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.05k | £17.33k | £42.77k | £27.44k | £50.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £50.31k | £35.38k | £68.32k | £51.86k | £39.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £712.34k | £933.63k | £973.09k | £948.59k | £591.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.67m | -£2.66m | -£2.56m | -£2.46m | -£2.33m | |
|
Total liabilities | £267.42k | £237.38k | £367.48k | £530.70k | £387.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JUL 2016 as amended on 07 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. PROVIDING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN THE STUDENT MEMBERS AND THE UNIVERSITY, AND BETWEEN THE STUDENT MEMBERS AND ANY OTHER BODY; 2. PROMOTING THE WELFARE, WELLBEING, AND INTEREST OF STUDENTS THROUGH REPRESENTATION, ADVOCACY AND GUIDANCE; 3. ENHANCING THE EXPERIENCE OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, DEVELOPMENTAL, AND SPORTING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES; 4. REPRESENTING THE VIEWS AND INTERESTS OF STUDENTS WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 5. FOSTERING THE VALUES OF DEMOCRACY, OPENNESS, INCLUSIVITY, AND TOLERANCE AMONGST THE STUDENTS; 6. ALL SUCH OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW WHICH ARE INCIDENTAL TO OR CONDUCIVE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEEDS BECKETT STUDENTS' UNION
PORTLAND - GROUND FLOOR
CITY CAMPUS
LEEDS BECKETT UNIVERSITY
LEEDS
LS1 3HE
- Phone:
- 01138128400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window