Financial history PIMCO FOUNDATION EUROPE

Charity Number: 1139109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.02m £1.08m £1.35m £1.26m £1.54m
Total expenditure £698.33k £846.13k £899.81k £1.01m £1.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £974.85k £1.03m £1.29m £1.13m £1.39m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.57k £44.28k £52.64k £126.64k £150.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £696.97k £845.57k £898.24k £1.01m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.57k £26.28k £27.89k £32.03k £36.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £283.46k £312.17k £374.72k £404.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.35k £555 £1.57k £1.36k £0