CANNING TOWN AND CUSTOM HOUSE CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? The relief of poverty, sickness and distress by the provision of advice, information, support, translating and interpreting services in matters such as welfare benefits, health, housing, education, employment and training. ? The advancement of education in particular the provision of language and other subject classes. ? The provision of facilities for recreation and leisure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Standard registration
- ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shamim Ahmed | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Shanjab Ali | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nurool Islam | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ayna Miah | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIZAM UDDIN AHMED CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £370 | £2.44k | £2.96k | £7.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.42k | £0 | £1.22k | £450 | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 16 BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION CLASSES AND HOMEWORK TUITION CLASSES 2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CANNING TOWN AND CUSTOM HOUSE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS 3) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 4) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY (REFER TO CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION FOR A DEFINITION OF 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED').
Area of benefit
CANNING TOWN AND CUSTOM HOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 Sark Walk
London
E16 3PX
- Phone:
- 07958043183
- Email:
- CTACHCA@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window