Accounts and annual returns THE POLISH LANGUAGE AND CULTURAL CENTRE IN NOTTINGHAM

Charity Number: 1139846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 18 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 March 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window