P2I CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the P2i Charitable Trust is to support scientific education and the lives of underpriveleged children in the regions where P2i operates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Wiltshire
- China
- United States
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahilan Rabindran | Chair | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54k | £9.49k | £974 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £1.00k | £2.39k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1093 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1093 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN THE FOLLOWING REGIONS: I. THE COUNTIES OF OXFORDSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; II. THE SAVANNAH, GEORGIA AND BEAVERTON, OREGON REGIONS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; III. THE COUNTRY OF SINGAPORE; IV. THE GUANGDONG PROVINCE IN CHINA; AND V. SUCH GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATIONS IN WHICH P2I LIMITED AND ITS SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES MAY OPERATE FROM TIME TO TIME; INCLUDING FUNDING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AID IN THE WAKE OF NATURAL DISASTERS, SUPPORTING SCHEMES WHICH PROVIDE FOOD AND WATER TO CHILDREN IN NEED, AND THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE, BEDDING, CLOTHING, FOOD, FUEL, AND HEATING APPLIANCES TO THE FAMILIES OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS IN THE SAME GEOGRAPHICAL REGIONS LISTED IN THE PRECEDING OBJECT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TEXT BOOKS AND SCIENTIFIC EQUIPMENT, FUNDING CLASSROOM SUPPORT, AND SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH SCHOOLS SUCH AS PARENT-TEACHER GROUPS AND PRIZE FUNDS; AND 3. THE SUPPORT OF OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES WHICH SHARE COMMON OBJECTS WITH THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
P 2 I Ltd
126B Olympic Avenue
Milton Park,Milton
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 4SA
- Phone:
- 01235833100
- Email:
- charitabletrust@p2i.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window