ALL ABOUT ANIMALS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rescue , rehabilitation and rehoming of domestic, farm animals and equines rescue centre to keep elderly and sick animals mobile clinics and workshops helping working donkeys and horses in the Gambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- The Gambia
Governance
- 13 May 2011: Standard registration
- 26 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALL ABOUT ANIMALS IN MEMORY OF HENRY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2016 | 01/01/2017 | 01/01/2018 | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £9.87k | £9.88k | £8.64k | £860 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £9.80k | £9.95k | £8.64k | £860 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOMESTIC AND FARM ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR SUCH ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS AND IN PARTICULAR: 1 THE RESCUE AND REHABILITATION AND RE-HOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS; AND 2 OPERATING MOBILE ANIMAL CLINICS IN GAMBIA
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ISLE OF WIGHT AND GAMBIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window