Financial history THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM UK PROVINCE LTD

Charity number: 1139822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £144.64k £338.98k £342.17k £246.29k £186.59k
Total expenditure £96.05k £198.99k £208.99k £209.79k £200.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A