THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM UK PROVINCE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice, Counselling and Church Ministry within the community and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 January 2011: Standard registration
- C & S UK PROVINCE (Working name)
- THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM (Previous name)
- THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM, UK PROVINCE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR SAM BADEJO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emmauel Osemobo Osebor | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Lamjose Bob-Manuel Prelate | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Napoleon Emuchay Secretary | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Egwuchukwu Onuoha | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chinyere Wogu-Nzeakor | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adedapo Odunela | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olawale Enoch-Ajibola | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
UKACHI BAWO | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.64k | £338.98k | £342.17k | £246.29k | £186.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.05k | £198.99k | £208.99k | £209.79k | £200.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 12 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE MINISTRY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE SPIRITUAL CHRISTIAN GOSPEL, THE TENETS AND PRACTICE OF THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND THE UK BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE SPIRITUAL CHRISTIAN GOSPEL THROUGH PRAYERS, EVANGELISM, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HOLDING REGULAR FELLOWSHIPS AND SERVICE 7 TIMES AND 7 DAYS A WEEK INCLUDING SUNDAY SERVICE. TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE PAROCHIAL MINISTRIES TRUSTEES OR COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Chatham Street
LONDON
SE17 1PA
- Phone:
- 02088645001
- Email:
- SAM.BADEJO1@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window