Financial history CARE IN MIND

Charity number: 1139601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.16k £120.28k £14.25k £17.00k £97.38k
Total expenditure £83.13k £99.69k £18.00k £15.38k £87.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A