Financial history BHAKT BHAKTI AUR BHAGWAN ASHRAM UK

Charity number: 1139867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £66.31k £160.24k £71.95k £59.47k £122.91k
Total expenditure £63.89k £135.08k £51.95k £53.73k £158.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A