NORTH TYNE & REDESDALE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Partnership is to improve the quality of life for those living, working and visiting the area (North Tyne and Redesdale valleys). The Partnership complements the non-statutory work of the Parish Councils, in it's ability to source and secure funding for projects. It also, where possible supports and encourages sustainable and economic development within the communities it serves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 16 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Bush | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Morton | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Avril Hair | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Dickson-Green | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Paul Dickson-Green | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGRET WILSON | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH MATTHEW LITTLE | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BILLANY | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DENHAM | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.27k | £25.36k | £30.61k | £26.80k | £35.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.75k | £23.09k | £20.09k | £23.23k | £32.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH TYNE AND REDESDALE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NTRCP
Station House
Bellingham
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE48 2DG
- Phone:
- 01434240691
- Email:
- contact@ntrcp.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window