Financial history NORTH LONDON SWEDISH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1141864
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.21k £22.85k £24.51k £25.37k £25.05k
Total expenditure £24.85k £27.90k £21.26k £20.77k £22.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A