THE UNCLE BILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to provide gifts to charitable organisations, based on the recommendations from the founder. The charitable objects are to apply the income, and all such parts of the capital as the Trustees think fit (whether through donations to other charities or by any other charitable means), for or towards such charitable purposes the Trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Standard registration
- THE NIGHT GARDEN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fleur Michelle Tibbitts | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Benjamin Williams | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Michelle Walker | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Perrin | Trustee | 08 October 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.00k | £30.00k | £60.00k | £50.00k | £70.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.81k | £28.60k | £47.64k | £62.18k | £68.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 08 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (WHETHER THROUGH DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES OR BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS), FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waresley Grange
Old Worcester Road
Waresley
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY11 7XL
- Phone:
- 01299 251743
- Email:
- SARAH.HEATON@WFOSERVICES.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window