ST ANDREW'S & ST MARK'S C OF E JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1139152
Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School parent teacher association: fundraising events on behalf of St Andrews and St Marks C of E Junior School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £4,634
Total expenditure: £10,172

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SASM PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janene Olivier Trustee 26 July 2022
None on record
Joanne Church Trustee 21 February 2022
None on record
Chantelle Mukalazi Trustee 26 October 2021
KINGSTON CODING FOR KIDS
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £10.73k £11.74k £4.14k £4.34k £4.63k
Total expenditure £8.13k £7.55k £11.34k £2.12k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 July 2023 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
StAndrewsandStMarks CofE School
Maple Road
SURBITON
Surrey
KT6 4AL
Phone:
02083902976
Website:

No information available