Accounts and annual returns HOLDING HANDS CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1142168
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 April 2015 02 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2014 03 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2013 04 April 2014 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2012 11 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2012 Not Required