BROOK GREEN NURSERY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education, learning, nurturing and play activities to pre-school children in a healthy, friendly and caring environment. This incorporated Charity changed name to Brook Green Nursery on 18 May 2015; it was linked to the un-incorporated Addison Pre-School Playgroup, Charity number 1018982 which was taken over by the incorporated charity and ceased trading.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £72,046 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 08 June 2011: Standard registration
- 04 February 2014: Funds received from 1018982 ADDISON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- ADDISON PRE-SCHOOL LTD. (Working name)
- ADDISON PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean-Christophe Clair | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mitchell | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lederer | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Nunziata | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.69k | £131.11k | £121.53k | £154.50k | £182.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.14k | £140.37k | £143.13k | £167.05k | £225.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.05k | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.29k | £53.10k | £52.70k | £82.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 1) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BVECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILILTY; 2) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brook Green Nursery
49 Brook Green
LONDON
W6 7BJ
- Phone:
- 02076025868
- Email:
- info@brookgreennursery.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window