ELSTREE AND BOREHAMWOOD MASORTI COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support and maintenance of the Elstree and Borehamwood Masorti Community (the "Community") and the advancement and promotion of the practice and teaching of Masorti (traditional) Judaism in accordance with the provisions of the memorandum and articles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 November 2010: Standard registration
- EBMC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH RAYMOND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jay Dor | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ALISON ARELLANO | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP BAKER KC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.21k | £52.88k | £60.26k | £51.72k | £34.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.22k | £53.47k | £55.50k | £47.45k | £15.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ELSTREE AND BOREHAMWOOD MASORTI COMMUNITY (THE "COMMUNITY") AND THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE AND TEACHING OF MASORTI (TRADITIONAL) JUDAISM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WOODSIDE
ELSTREE
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 3NR
- Phone:
- 02089531838
- Email:
- admin@ebmc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window