Financial history CAER (CENTRE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH)

Charity number: 1139729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £30 £45 £20 £20 £60
Total expenditure £25 £0 £15 £15 £45
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A