Financial history CHRIST SHELTER MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1138603
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £24.78k £24.68k £24.40k £23.89k £24.35k
Total expenditure £23.97k £23.03k £22.40k £22.97k £23.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A