Financial history PATHFIELD ACTIVITIES CLUB

Charity Number: 1140016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £70.90k £79.54k £85.49k £94.55k £94.30k
Total expenditure £74.63k £70.13k £78.83k £86.11k £95.05k
Income from government contracts £20.98k £9.38k £23.27k £30.87k £32.52k
Income from government grants N/A £2.96k £4.71k N/A N/A