PATHFIELD ACTIVITIES CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOOD TECH. - life skills based activities - shopping/preparing their own lunch. ARTS & CRAFTS MUSIC & DANCE - instruments, dance, musical games. FUN & GAMES - group games, board games, computers. SENSORY ACTIVITIES - Tac Pac, light room sessions, hydro pool OUTINGS INTO THE COMMUNITY - to shops, cafes, museums, parks. The club has use of Pathfield School's vehicles for trips
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £32,515 from 22 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 25 January 2011: Standard registration
- PAC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Palmer | Chair | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Skene | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ingle | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Williams | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Chivers | Trustee | 13 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline May Parr | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Herman | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP LESLIE DARKE | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.90k | £79.54k | £85.49k | £94.55k | £94.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.63k | £70.13k | £78.83k | £86.11k | £95.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.98k | £9.38k | £23.27k | £30.87k | £32.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.96k | £4.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS), TO BE FURTHERED IN NORTH DEVON, ARE TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND SEVERE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS, WITHIN AN ENVIRONMENT THAT PROVIDES AND PROMOTES THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING AS WELL AS PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THEIR PARENTS AND/OR CARERS.
Area of benefit
NORTH DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PATHFIELD SCHOOL
ABBEY ROAD
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1JU
- Phone:
- 07403676804
- Email:
- pac@pathfield.devon.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window