KIDS 'N' CANCER UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to provide assistance, support and treatment for children with cancer. Proton therapy is the latest form of Radiation Treatment currently not available in the UK and therefore assist in overseas costs. We provide financial support and fund raising kits to enable families to reach their goal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- 24 June 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KIDS "N" CANCER (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.36k | £405.04k | £741.33k | £400.09k | £445.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.39k | £374.30k | £639.28k | £390.20k | £569.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £635.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £54 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £106.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £484.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £55.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO AIDE, SUPPORT, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN SUFFERING WITH TUMOURS, LEUKAEMIA OR CANCER (AND RELATED CONDITIONS) BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING: A) SUPPORTING THE FAMILIES AND THE CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING WITH TUMOURS, LEUKAEMIA OR CANCER (AND RELATED CONDITIONS) BY FINANCIALLY ASSISTING TRIPS TO THE USA FOR TREATMENTS WITH PROTON THERAPY; B) SPONSORING AND ARRANGING FAMILY VACATIONS FOR THOSE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING WITH TUMOURS, LEUKAEMIA OR CANCER (AND RELATED CONDITIONS) INCLUDING TRAVEL INSURANCE, ACCOMMODATION AND FLIGHTS; C) BY PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF PROTON THERAPY TREATMENT INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ADVICE AS TO HOW TO FUND TRIPS TO THE USA FOR THE PATIENT AND FAMILY OR CARERS. D) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING OF PATIENTS WHO ARE BEING CARED FOR AT HOME BY GIVING GRANTS TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES E) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER CARE AND OTHER LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES AT HOME. F) CO-OPERATION AND COLLABORATION WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND ANY OTHER BODIES IN RELATION TO THE FOREGOING OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AND THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SOCIETIES OR BODIES AS ARE FROM TIME TO TIME IN ANY WAY CONCERNED WITH THE FURTHERANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF CANCER RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window