Financial history SRI LANKA ISLAMIC FORUM TRUST UK (SLIF UK TRUST)

Charity number: 1140640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £3.73k £5.05k £0 £0 £1.60k
Total expenditure £2.59k £0 £3.47k £1.58k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A