Financial history TAMWORTH IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1141899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £7.46k £2 £3 £85 £246
Total expenditure £11.76k £853 £3.17k £377 £267
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A