Financial history MARJON STUDENT UNION

Charity number: 1150327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £160.65k £159.71k £188.11k £180.78k £162.99k
Total expenditure £138.66k £146.98k £129.06k £111.54k £146.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A