Financial history BEDAZZLE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1140390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £194.94k £195.38k £177.53k £325.42k £363.08k
Total expenditure £165.52k £169.60k £194.70k £343.97k £367.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £77.69k £76.51k £146.68k £246.23k
Income from government grants £11.92k £3.00k £200 £2.00k N/A