MOUNT HANNA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of nursery and primary education in Hanover, Jamaica, Kenya and North West London, in particular burt not exclusively, by supporting families and to provide educational support to the underprivileged in Hanover, Jamaica (in particular), Mount Hanna School, Kenya and North West London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Jamaica
- Kenya
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyd Patterson LLB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JASMINE JUDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.61k | £15.37k | £29.17k | £27.79k | £23.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.99k | £21.61k | £29.21k | £27.94k | £23.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 6 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF NURSERY AND PRIMARY EDUCATION IN HANOVER, JAMAICA, KENYA AND NORTH WEST LONDON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY SUPPORTING FAMILIES AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO THE UNDERPRIVILEGED IN HANOVER, JAMAICA (IN PARTICULAR), MOUNT HANNA SCHOOL, KENYA AND NORTH WEST LONDON ENGLAND B) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE ABOVE STATED LOCATIONS
Area of benefit
HANOVER, JAMAICA, KENYA AND NORTH WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bertie Road Resource Centre
BERTIE ROAD
WILLESDEN
LONDON
NW10 2LH
- Phone:
- 0208 459 1557
- Email:
- info@mounthanna.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window