Financial history BAILIFF BRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1139333
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £76.14k £20.58k £58.59k £65.40k £83.57k
Total expenditure £76.30k £27.93k £46.14k £66.08k £94.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.00k £6.67k N/A £4.90k