YOUTH PROSPECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Prospects provides sports, music and diversionary activities for young people in North London. Youth Prospects provides employment, training, qualifications and childcare for families in Thurrock
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Camden
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Thurrock
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 21 December 2010: Standard registration
- HARINGEY WARRIORS YOUTH ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- HWYO (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMONE PETERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patrice Fennell | Trustee | 02 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Salek-Haddai | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
TANYA HUSEYIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.38k | £61.28k | £67.84k | £45.45k | £39.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.11k | £61.93k | £65.97k | £43.69k | £36.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.15k | £36.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 469 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 469 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 May 2024 | 834 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 May 2024 | 834 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/01/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON THROUGH A THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE B PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth Prospects
64 Whitehall Lane
Grays
Thurrock
RM17 6SH
- Phone:
- 07985440705
- Email:
- youthprospects@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window