UNITE AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- 11 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UNITE AID LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 21 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 21 October 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 21 October 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, SCHOLARSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSON SUFFERING FROM DRUG AND ALCOHOL ADDICTION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN NECESSITONS CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD SHELTER AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES. ALL BENEFITS ARE OF PUBLIC USE THERE WILL BE NO FEES WILL BE CHARGED BY ONE ORGANISATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window