NOOR INAYAT KHAN MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of equality and diversity and racial and religious harmony by fostering understanding between people from diverse backgrounds through the identification of exceptional individuals whose lives can be used as role models and inspiration for individuals from all sections of society. As a first step, the Trust is raising funds for a memorial for WWII heroine Noor Inayat Khan, G.C.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 February 2011: Standard registration
- 30 May 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NIKMT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £350 | £170 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £1.64k | £1.02k | £1.26k | £2.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (OBJECTS) IS THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HANNONY BY FOSTERING UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS THROUGH THE IDENTIFICATION OF EXCEPTIONAL INDIVIDUALS WHOSE LIVES CAN BE USED AS ROLE MODELS AND INSPIRATION FOR INDIVIDUALS FROM ALL SECTIONS OF SOCIETY"
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window