Beads of Courage UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Under licence from Beads of Courage Inc., Beads of Courage UK offers emotional support to children with chronic and serious illness by providing Beads of Courage programmes to Oncology/Haematology, Burns, Cardiac, NICU, and Chronic Conditions units throughout the United Kingdom and Ireland. Beads of Courage restores a child's sense of self when coping with a serious illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 May 2011: Standard registration
- BCCA (Working name)
- BE CHILD CANCER AWARE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH DRUMMOND | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEN WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.48k | £339.24k | £325.58k | £252.24k | £272.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.85k | £228.37k | £416.10k | £161.14k | £351.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/04/2013 as amended on 23 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ON THE SIGNS AND SYMPTOMS OF CHILDHOOD CANCER AND BY SUPPORTING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH CHILDHOOD CANCER AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 RADLOW CRESCENT
BIRMINGHAM
B37 7LZ
- Phone:
- 07534 949254
- Email:
- info@beadsofcourageuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window