GOBO THEATRE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gobo Theatre Foundation is a charity created to help support, mentor and inspire young people in the theatrical arts with a focus on ensuring that opportunities are not only available to those who can afford it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 March 2011: Standard registration
- GOBO THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY SCOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sofie Mirza | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Paterson | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Rance-McGregor | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.51k | £19.55k | £23.96k | £28.06k | £10.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.38k | £24.75k | £20.47k | £26.47k | £10.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 October 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/08/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE ADULTS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVISION OF TRAINING IN SKILLS REQUIRED FOR A CAREER IN THEATRE; AND 2) TO ADVANCE THE ARTISTIC TASTE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 MANOR GREEN
HARWELL
DIDCOT
OX11 0DQ
- Phone:
- 07970581924
- Email:
- info@gobotheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window