Accounts and annual returns EMPOWER YOUTH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1139613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 03 April 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 03 April 2025 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 03 April 2025 734 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 17 March 2025 1082 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required