Financial history WHISPER

Charity number: 1139078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £227.29k £271.73k £381.00k £280.00k £168.34k
Total expenditure £215.48k £269.20k £329.00k £296.08k £199.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A