Financial history SPEAKERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1139377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £881.36k £716.74k £1.31m £1.21m £1.44m
Total expenditure £862.79k £703.40k £1.20m £1.21m £1.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.73k £5.99k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £105.82k £92.78k £150.42k £47.68k £122.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £770.09k £618.37k £1.15m £1.15m £1.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.07k £5.25k £7.96k £18.34k £28.62k
Income - Other £373 £353 £1.50k £594 £493
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £840.86k £683.35k £1.15m £1.18m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.92k £20.05k £51.34k £23.78k £23.82k
Expenditure - Governance £4.84k £4.34k £6.80k £0 £7.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0