BRITANNIA ECONOMICAL SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support elderly people , advocacy and legal advice, Free used Cloths Distribution, Education and training programme, community development, Covid 19 support activities and other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Md Halim Bepari LLB,LLM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Md Hasan Manik | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moazzem Hossain | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIA NUSRAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.25k | £11.36k | £9.95k | £15.61k | £19.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.49k | £15.06k | £15.19k | £15.84k | £17.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 17 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES EFFECTED. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ASIAN COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGHS OF LONDON, AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND HEALTH. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING. C. ADVANCING THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ASIAN CULTURE, IN PARTICULAR RAISING CULTURAL AWARENESS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
725 Barking Road
LONDON
E13 9EU
- Phone:
- 02035811368
- Email:
- info@bestcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window