North Yorkshire Moors Railway Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A living museum providing educational experiences of operating UK railway heritage, preservation and access to historic steam and diesel locomotives, carriages, structures, artefacts and archives, with the welfare benefits of volunteering opportunities and conservation of its species rich lineside environment in a National Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income:
£9,638,007
Donations and legacies | £1.67m | |
Charitable activities | £4.70m | |
Other trading activities | £3.25m | |
Investments | £12.49k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,114,902
Raising funds | £346.11k | |
Charitable activities | £7.61m | |
Other | £2.16m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £464,067 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.50m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.61m |
People

150 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
1029 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 February 1972: Standard registration
- NORTH YORKSHIRE MOORS RAILWAY (Working name)
- NORTH YORK MOORS HISTORICAL RAILWAY TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Swift | Chair | 28 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew David Mead | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|||||
COLIN MARTIN | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Slack | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
TAMMIE McGEE | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TUUKKA LAAKSO | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE FRANCES AURELIE DODDS | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP CURETON BAILEY | Trustee | 21 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRUCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew John Scott | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.86m | £9.91m | £9.61m | £7.87m | £9.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61m | £5.54m | £7.20m | £8.39m | £10.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.07m | £2.60m | £979.13k | £351.88k | £464.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.26m | £7.10m | £3.45m | £1.42m | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.56m | £906.31k | £2.60m | £2.63m | £3.25m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.03m | £1.07m | £3.36m | £3.79m | £4.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.56k | £3.72k | £10.99k | £22.58k | £12.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £817.87k | £186.44k | £732 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £885.75k | £539.10k | £462.39k | £548.54k | £571.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.77m | £4.04m | £5.40m | £6.21m | £7.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.84m | £246.06k | £230.66k | £307.45k | £346.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.38k | £17.82k | £22.04k | £24.74k | £29.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £1.26m | £1.57m | £1.87m | £2.16m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.97m | £15.78m | £18.51m | £18.00m | £19.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.08m | £5.34m | £5.64m | £2.50m | £1.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.31m | £5.01m | £5.63m | £2.50m | £3.79m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2016 as amended on 31 Mar 2022 as amended on 28 Apr 2022 as amended on 31 Mar 2022 as amended on 31 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects are. (a) The education of people of all backgrounds through the operation of a living museum demonstrating the impact of the coal-powered steam railway as a catalyst for the rapid expansion of the Industrial Revolution and a foundation of modern societies and economies. (b) The advancement of heritage by the preservation and operation for the public benefit of the historical railway line across the North York Moors between Grosmont and Pickering, North Yorkshire including the preservation, conservation, maintenance, repair and demonstration of: (i) heritage locomotives and rolling stock; (ii) heritage railway buildings, bridges and other historic railway structures; (iii) heritage signalling systems; and (iv) railway archives historical records and artefacts and the operation of heritage steam and diesel trains over the railway and other third party owned or controlled lines. (c) The advancement of citizenship, community development and individual wellbeing for all ages, backgrounds and ethnicities through the promotion of volunteering, learning and training including training and development in at-risk heritage skills. (d) The advancement of conservation of the flora, fauna and species within the Charity’s lineside estate, adjacent to and within the North York Moors National Park, including designated areas of special scientific interest forming part of that estate.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Yorkshire Moors Railway Trust
12 Park Street
PICKERING
North Yorkshire
YO18 7AJ
- Phone:
- 01751 473799
- Email:
- admin@nymr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window