RESCUE REMEDIES DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue Remedies currently saves in excess of 300 dogs per annum. These dogs are on the euthanasia lists within local authority pounds throughout England and Wales. We accept those whose lives are in imminent danger. All dogs are medically examined, spayed, neutered vaccinated and microchipped in preparation prior to homing. We pay private boarding kennels for our dogs until their home is found.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2010: Standard registration
- STAFFIE RESCUE, TERRIER RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA DA COSTA | Chair | 12 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
Cora McLaren | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Brian Biggs | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.25k | £216.00k | £158.00k | £285.01k | £264.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.32k | £251.67k | £214.93k | £217.51k | £247.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 24 October 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 24 October 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 18 Oct 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY DOGS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caring4canines
Hathersham Lane
Smallfield
Horley
Surrey
RH6 9JG
- Phone:
- 07794 362712
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window