Accounts and annual returns RELIEVE AND CARE

Charity number: 1139293
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 July 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 22 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2019 23 May 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2019 Not Required