BARNET COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barnet Community Projects exists to facilitate long term social improvement in the London Borough of Barnet. We do this through residents engagement, empowering them to deliver projects that make a difference to the local community. We deliver youth activities, community cafe, skatepark sessions, reparation projects, mentoring programmes, sports sessions & activities to address disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 20 December 2010: Standard registration
- BCP (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Benaim | Chair | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rachel Not | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Bull | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEN MORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Pegum | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.76k | £96.54k | £112.16k | £106.26k | £111.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.29k | £84.38k | £106.66k | £107.62k | £115.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £7.15k | £5.60k | £3.62k | £2.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2010 as amended on 25 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYãS OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE APPLICATION AND USE OF RESOURCES BY NON CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE SET UP OF COMMUNITY PROJECTS, SUPPORTING THEIR ADMINISTRATION AND PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES TO THEM; AND BY FACILITATING PARTNERSHIP AND CO-OPERATION IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR: (1) "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS; (2) "CHARITIES" ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; (3) "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) IDENTIFYING NEED IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; (B) LIASING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND OTHER GROUPS OR ORGANISATIONS ON RELEVANT ISSUES THAT AFFECT MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; (C) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO YOUNG PEOPLE - 'COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING" MEANS DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (D) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP NEW SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE; AND (F) TO FURTHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF COMMUNITY MEMBERS. WHERE IN THE VIEW OF THE TRUSTEES IT IS EXPEDIENT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE CHARITY, THE TRUSTEES MAY SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE OVERSEAS PARTNERSHIP PROJECTS WHICH ARE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY FOCUSED IN SUCH COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD AS THEY SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Rainbow Centre
Dollis Valley Drive
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 2UN
- Phone:
- 020 8441 4848
- Email:
- accounts@barnetcp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window