AL-HUDA ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION / TRAINING FOR MUSLIMS RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES ARTS / CULTURE / HERITAGE /
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 February 2011: Standard registration
- AHIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED ARTAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
YOUSUF WARSAME | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMOUD BARASAB | Trustee | 25 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF DERIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AHMED HUSSEIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAEED MOHAMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AHMED ABDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.02k | £10.21k | £13.79k | £17.32k | £24.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.93k | £7.38k | £7.92k | £18.77k | £17.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 2011
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND PRAYERS BE UPON HIM) AND WITH THE CORRECT UNDERSTANDING OF THE SALAF (TILE PIOUS PREDECESSORS); BY THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES 2.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST MUSLIMS) ON THE SUBJECT OF RELIGIOUS TOLERANCE TO COUNTER EXTREMISM AND THE INDOCTRINATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE. 2.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.;
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al Huda Islamic Centre
Hanover Street
SHEFFIELD
S3 7WT
- Phone:
- 0114 2720727
- Email:
- hudacentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
alhudamasjid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window