HOME-START WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start provides informal, friendly, confidential, non-judgmental and free support to families with young children through networks of trained parent volunteers. Home-Start Worldwide works worldwide through partnerships with local organisations to develop Home-Start schemes. In rich and poor communities, in 22 countries on five continents, Home-Start reaches out to families in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
Governance
- 05 January 2011: Standard registration
- 25 June 2013: Funds received from 1076991 HOME-START INTERNATIONAL
- HSW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jacqueline Barnes | Chair | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Maloney | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reka Hegedus | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cornelia de Bruijn | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthonius Gerardus Kragten | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hickson | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yukie Yamada | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan van Niekerk | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £14.00k | £47.55k | £73.23k | £74.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.34k | £10.85k | £38.31k | £76.99k | £64.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 09 SEP 2010
Charitable objects
1.1. TO SAFEGUARD AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS, PARENTS AND PRIMARY CARERS; 1.2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONG CHILDREN, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR PRIMARY CARERS; 1.2 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 1.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS AND THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
63/66 Hatton Garden
Fifth Floor Suite 23
London
EC1N 8LE
- Phone:
- 07932651576
- Email:
- info@homestartworldwide.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window